Attalla, Mona Samir Gergis (CPSO#: 79726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1B
7955 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0J8
Phone: (905) 455-8877
Fax: (905) 455-8867
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.S. Attalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Attalla ( CPSO# 79726 )

Business Address:
1B - 7955 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0J8
Phone Number: (905) 455-8877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA SAMIR GERGIS ATTALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005