Attar, Suzan Mansour Hussin (CPSO#: 80102)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 14 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2005 to 14 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006