Atwood, Jennifer Adriana (CPSO#: 77456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1223
Fax: (807) 623-8832
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Atwood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Atwood ( CPSO# 77456 )

Business Address:
201 - 1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ADRIANA ATWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004