Au, Hosanna Chi Mei (CPSO#: 76403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7841
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOSANNA CHI MEI AU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005