Au, Wing-Fai Frederick (CPSO#: 28786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
N C S B 1C-571
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3372
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederick Au Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Au ( CPSO# 28786 )

Business Address:
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 856-4800

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto General Hospital NCSB
1C-546 - 585 University Avenue
NCSB
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor, Fell Pavilion
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
918 - 610 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto General Hospital
1C-571 - 585 University Avenue
NCSB
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WING-FAI FREDERICK AU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1976