Aubin, Jean Maurice (CPSO#: 21133)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2012


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website:
Date Received: 01 Aug 2012


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2012