Aubin, Mary Susan Lee (CPSO#: 65445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 733-4411
Fax: (613) 733-3990
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Lee Aubin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aubin ( CPSO# 65445 )

Business Address:
Suite 410
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 733-4411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY SUSAN LEE AUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993