Aubin, Pierre Philippe (CPSO#: 71941)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 1997 to 16 Nov 1997
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001