Aubrey, Michael Eric (CPSO#: 52472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixon Medical Centre
531 Davis Drive
Suite 307
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-1843
Fax: (905) 853-1863
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael E. Aubrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aubrey ( CPSO# 52472 )

Business Address:
Dixon Medical Centre
307 - 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 853-1843

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ERIC AUBREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBREY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1986