Aubrey-Bassler, Christine Marie (CPSO#: 75137)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Bassler, Christine Marie (used until: 14 Aug 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aubrey Bassler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 18 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008