Aubry, Joan (CPSO#: 76019)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smith & Aubry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017