Auchinachie, Keith Taylor (CPSO#: 27838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
353 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 756-0331
Fax: (519) 756-0332
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Taylor Auchinachie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Auchinachie ( CPSO# 27838 )

Business Address:
353 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 756-0331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH TAYLOR AUCHINACHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUCHINACHIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jan 2008
Summary:

 On January 10, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Auchinachie to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct  in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 

The Discipline Committee ordered the 
 following:

1. 	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Auchinachie(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, one (1) month of which shall be 
 suspended if Dr. Auchinachie successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Medical 
 Ethics and Informed Consent Course and provides proof thereof to the College. Such suspension 
 shall commence on March 1, 2008. The College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course shall be 
 completed by no later than April 30, 2008 and the second month of suspension shall be served on a 
 date to be set by the Registrar if proof of the successful completion of the course is not 
 provided.

2.	The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Auchinachie to appear before the Panel to be 
 reprimanded.

3.   	The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Auchinachie to pay costs to the College in 
 the amount of $3,650.00. 

4.    	 The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding 
 to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 10, 2008