Audet, Nathalie (CPSO#: 76751)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2003