Auger, Julie Rachel (CPSO#: 68985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Manor
481 Melrose Blvd
Timmins ON  P4N 5H3
Phone: 705-360-2644
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Auger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Auger ( CPSO# 68985 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 360-4685

Business Address:
Golden Manor Nursing Home
481 Melrose Boulevard
Timmins ON  P4N 5H3
Phone Number: (705) 360-2644

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE RACHEL AUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997