Auguste, Jacqueline Anne (CPSO#: 78280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: Smith, Jacqueline Anne (used until: 08 Aug 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3695 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1N2
Phone: (647) 347-7218
Fax: (416) 352-5123
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M3M 0B2
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: (416) 352-5123
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANNE AUGUSTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGUSTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2002