Augustin, Jean Emmanuel (CPSO#: 28067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400B
2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 837-8316
Fax: (613) 837-2820
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613) 938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN EMMANUEL AUGUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1976