Augustine, Sajit (CPSO#: 104692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Rd, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2014 to 25 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sajit Augistine may practise medicine only as required by the
                  clinical fellowship program in Neonatal Perinatal Medicine in which Dr.
                  Augustine is enrolled in the Department of Paediatrics, University of
                  Ottawa;

            2.    Dr. Augustine shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients
                  of  a  clinical  teaching  unit  that  is  formally  affiliated  with the
                  department  where  Dr.  Augustine is properly practising medicine and  to
                  which postgraduate trainees  are  regularly assigned by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Augustine shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on December 30, 2017.