Aujla, Prince Sarabsukhjit Singh (CPSO#: 75013)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-508-5911
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prince Aujla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Aujla ( CPSO# 75013 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 508-5911

Business Address:
MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
Level 2
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-8011

Business Address:
Suite 101
Building A
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 883-2133

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRINCE SARABSUKHJIT SINGH AUJLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUJLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004