Aul, Sewa Singh (CPSO#: 51588)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Shivaji University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2011