Aulakh, Mark Harpreet Singh (CPSO#: 109827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 21 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
602 - 500 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK HARPREET SINGH AULAKH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AULAKH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AULAKH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AULAKH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AULAKH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AULAKH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AULAKH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Dec 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2017 to 20 Nov 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017