Aung, Kyaw Lwin (CPSO#: 104874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institue of Medicine I, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
and Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 14 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Kyaw Lwin Aung may practise medicine only as required by the clinical
                  fellowship program in medical oncology in which Dr. Aung is enrolled in
                  the Department of Medicine, University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr.  Aung  shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients of
                  a clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr.  is  properly  practising  medicine  and  to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned by the department as  part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr.  Aung shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on August 31, 2018.

            Note: This  certificate  has  an  interim expiry date of June 30,  2018.   Upon
                  renewal  of  Dr.  Aung's fellowship  appointment  at  the  University  of
                  Toronto, the expiry  date  can be extended, subject to the limitations in
                  paragraph 4 above.