Austgarden, Douglas Allen (CPSO#: 69452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Simcoe Clinic
279 Yonge Street-Unit 2
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Fax: (705) 737-4733
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Austgarden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Austgarden ( CPSO# 69452 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ALLEN AUSTGARDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTGARDEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000