Austin, Joseph John (CPSO#: 50100)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009