Austin, Katherine M. (CPSO#: 64762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: Leonard, Katherine Austin (used until: 24 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Florida, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2306 Walton Ave
Bronx, New York, 10468
New York City NY  10468
United States
Phone: (718) 483-1270 Ext. 2515

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE M. AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1993