Austin, Marc Robert (CPSO#: 73482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Bluewater Health
89 Norman street
Sarnia ON  N7T 2N1
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 5214
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Monitoring Consultants
118 Victoria Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 2A1
Canada
Phone: (519) 337-5000
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Austin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Austin ( CPSO# 73482 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Monitoring Consultants
118 Victoria Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 337-5000

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
233 Cameron Street
Sarnia ON  N0N 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 813-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ROBERT AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002