Austin, Richard Conolly (CPSO#: 21418)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 18 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent S Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 email : info@rsrs.com
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 01 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 18 Mar 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Mar 2014
Summary:

On March 18, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Austin committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in 
his care and treatment of four patients in 2005 and 2006. Dr. Austin admitted the allegations. 
 
Dr. Austin practised obstetrics and gynaecology. In April 2007, Dr. Austin agreed to terms, 
conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration that restricted his obstetrical practice 
to office pre-natal care only, and required that his major gynaecological surgery and elective 
caesarean sections only be performed in the presence of another obstetrician/gynaecologist. 
These terms were to remain in effect until May 26, 2007, after which he would cease such 
surgery completely and would independently perform only minor gynaecological surgery. In 
2008, Dr. Austin resigned his membership with the College. 
 
An independent expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Austin failed to maintain the 
standard of practice as follows: 
 
      In relation to Patient A, in 2005, in performing a laparoscopic procedure due to 
      inappropriate patient selection. He displayed a lack of judgment in choosing to perform a 
      laparoscopy for lysis of adhesions in a patient with numerous laparotomies and known 
      adhesions.  He also failed to take into account, discuss and/or document the specific risk 
      factors for complications that this patient had, including a failure to make full disclosure 
      and/or document full disclosure following the patient's complication from surgery. 
 
      In relation to Patient B, in 2005, by not fully assessing the risk of malignancy of a simple 
      ovarian cyst in a postmenopausal woman. He also did not clearly consider and/or 
      document the risk of operative intervention as compared with conservative management. 
 
      In relation to Patient C, in 2006, in that he failed to adequately document his assessment 
      of Patient C and failed to adequately document a description of the surgery he performed. 
 
      In relation to Patient D, in 2005, in that he did not comply with the College's Policy on 
      Disclosure of Harm when he did not advise Patient D about a bowel perforation promptly 
      after gynecological surgery, tell her how the complication was managed and advise her of 
      any possible future consequences that might arise as a result of the complication. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar revoke Dr. Austin's certificate of registration, effective immediately.  
      Dr. Austin appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
      Dr. Austin pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date 
      of this Order.  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): March 18, 2014

Concerns

Source: Complaints Committee
Active Date: September 22, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Richard Conolly Austin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

(1) I, DR. RICHARD CONOLLY AUSTIN, having resigned my membership with the College as of June 1, 2008 hereby undertake not to re- apply to the College for a license or certificate to practise medicine in Ontario.

(2) I, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply to any College or regulatory authority for a license or certificate to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

(3) I, hereby agree that this document may be disclosed to any medical licensing body and may be posted on the College's register as information that is available to the public.

(4) I, acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College's Complaints Committee has agreed to take no further action with respect to the complaints currently before the Committee regarding my clinical care.