Auyeung, Anthony (CPSO#: 63928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Madison Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2S1
Phone: (416) 260-2004
Fax: (416) 260-2794
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Auyeung Professional Corporation (Medicine)

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Auyeung ( CPSO# 63928 )

Business Address:
34 Madison Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 260-2004

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY AUYEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUYEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Sep 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jun 2006
Summary:

 On June 26, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Anthony Auyeung committed professional misconduct in that he has engaged in an act 
 or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, 
 would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Auyeung(s certificate of 
 registration for a period of three (3) months, one (1) month of which shall be suspended if Dr. 
 Auyeung successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Boundaries Course and the 
 College(s Medical Ethics Course and provides proof thereof to the College.  The commencement date 
 for the suspension is July 1, 2006.

2.	Dr. Auyeung pay costs to the College in the amount of 
 $2,500.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 26, 2006