Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Auyeung, Grace Che Yan (CPSO#: 61290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 210
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 876-1066
Fax: (705) 876-8763
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webster Auyeung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Auyeung ( CPSO# 61290 )
Dr. J. Webster ( CPSO# 62215 )

Business Address:
Alexander Medical Building
210 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 876-1066

Business Address:
PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE CHE YAN AUYEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUYEUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990