Avanessian, Ardashes (CPSO#: 77340)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 10 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2004