Avdimiretz, Nicholas Andrew (CPSO#: 104901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ANDREW AVDIMIRETZ shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AVDIMIRETZ is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AVDIMIRETZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AVDIMIRETZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AVDIMIRETZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AVDIMIRETZ is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AVDIMIRETZ no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 26 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018