Averill, Owen Shillingford (CPSO#: 92850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitehorse Medical Services
406 Lambert street
Whitehorse YT  Y1A 1Z7
Phone: (867) 393-6600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OWEN SHILLINGFORD AVERILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVERILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013