Avram, Ronen (CPSO#: 73843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44891
Fax: (905) 381-7069
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R Avram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Avram ( CPSO# 73843 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONEN AVRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004