Avruch, Leonard Israel (CPSO#: 43313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trudy M. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hall ( CPSO# 103770)
Dr. T. Hall ( CPSO# 56284 )
Dr. L. Avruch ( CPSO# 43313 )

Business Address:
1-2530 St. Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1G1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD ISRAEL AVRUCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AVRUCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1985