Avula, Shivaram (CPSO#: 87989)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2008 to 30 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2008