Aw, Brian Jinsah (CPSO#: 65300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic
Unit A8
1390 Major MacKenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0A1
Phone: (905) 884-7711
Fax: (905) 780-9860
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Aw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Aw ( CPSO# 65300 )

Business Address:
Unit A8
1390 Major MacKenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 884-7711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JINSAH AW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993