Awad, Awad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 56639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
420 North Service Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 5R2
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Fax: (905) 338-2923
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

824 King ST. West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E3
Canada
Phone: 1-519-579-2002
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

1408 Ernest Ave #205
London ON  N6E 3B2
Canada
Phone: 1-519-685-6719
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

809 Brant street Suite 2
Burlington ON  L7R 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-1329
Fax: (905) 632-9015
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

77 The Queensway west suite 310
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 272-1114
Fax: (905) 272-1147
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AWAD IBRAHIM AWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2014
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Apr 2014
Summary:

On April 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Awad committed acts of professional 
misconduct. Dr. Awad admitted and the Committee found that he failed to maintain the standard 
of practice of the profession in respect to his care of thirteen sleep medicine patients; Dr. Awad 
pleaded no contest to and the Committee found that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in relation to 
his billing of OHIP for sleep medicine consultations.   
 
Dr. Awad is a psychiatrist, practising sleep medicine.  He is a diplomate of the American Board 
of Sleep Medicine. 
 
The independent expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Awad failed to maintain the 
standard of practice with respect to twelve of fifteen patient charts reviewed. Examples of 
concerns include: 
 
a)    He routinely directed nasal Continuous Positive Airway Pressure (CPAP) pressure 
      titration studies after the patients had undergone sleep studies without having seen and 
      evaluated the patients in question. 
b)    A patient had received immovane (5 mg) prior to CPAP titration study, without a 
      physician assessment or clear physician's order. On the basis of severe obstructive sleep 
      apnea and information provided by the family doctor in the patient's referral form, the 
      patient could be seen to be at risk of hypoventilation and excessive daytime somnolence. 
c)    In one instance, he signed an Assisted Devices Program (ADP) form for the use of nasal 
      CPAP prior to having seen the patient in consultation. 
d)    He, through his staff in the use of form letters, influenced patients to return to his clinic 
      for follow-up studies, by indicating that the patient's condition was reportable to the 
      Ministry of Transportation in case of lack of compliance to treatment recommendations. 
      Such communications were made even in instances when patients were not documented 
      to have excessive daytime somnolence or worrisome driving-related problems. The expert 
      opined that these letters were inappropriate and coercive. 
e)    He has delegated tasks to non-physician members of his staff inappropriately. A 
      discussion of diagnosis and treatment cannot be made by telephone by unqualified 
      clerical and technical staff. 
 
In response to the concerns identified by the expert, Dr. Awad has changed his practice.  
 
Regarding a complaint by Patient A, the independent expert opined that Dr. Awad failed to 
maintain the standard of practice as follows: 
 
a)    His letter to Patient A's family physician provides evidence that the clinic was 
      predisposed to CPAP therapy before patients had been seen by a sleep physician; 
b)    His records of care show that he misinformed the referring physician by declaring Patient 
      A to have a condition reportable to the Ministry of Transportation, before the patient had 
      been seen or assessed by a sleep physician. 
 
Regarding the finding of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct, Dr. Awad's 
office had billed OHIP for consultations, listing Dr. X as the referring physician in relation to 29 
patients. Dr. X indicated that he does not and never has referred patients to Dr. Awad and that he 
has no record of having seen any of these 29 patients. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Awad's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, to commence immediately. 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Awad's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
Practice Assessment 
 
i.    Dr. Awad, at his own expense, shall submit to an assessment of his practice by an 
      assessor selected by the College within six months of the date of this order.  The assessor 
      shall focus the assessment upon the deficiencies identified in the review of Dr. Awad's 
      practice and shall additionally consider Dr. Awad's performance as Quality Advisor as 
      referenced in the Independent Health Facilities Act, Ontario Regulation 57/92.   
ii.   Dr. Awad shall abide by all reasonable recommendations of the Assessor. 
      Dr. Awad appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
      Dr. Awad pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date 
      of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 4, 2014