Awad, Katie Antoun (CPSO#: 107810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33A Broadway Avenue, Unit 1
Orangeville ON  L9W 1J7
Phone: 519-938-9997
Fax: 519-938-9597
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Katie Antoun Awad may practise medicine independently in family medicine.