Awad, Saadeldin Mohamed Adbelnaby (CPSO#: 45903)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015