Awan, Saeed-Ur-Rehman (CPSO#: 81513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children Hospital of Orange County
505, Main St. Suite 225
Orange
Orange CA  92868
United States
Phone: (714) 364-4050
Fax: (714) 364-4051

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAEED-UR-REHMAN AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2004 to 20 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012