Awerbuck, David Charles (CPSO#: 56718)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2006