Axford-Gatley, Robert Abraham (CPSO#: 64145)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2007

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: July 12, 2007
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking, effective July 12, 2007, by Dr. Robert Abraham AXFORD-GATLEY to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College's Registration Department): I, DR. ROBERT AXFORD-GATLEY, hereby, 1. resign from the College, effective immediately, 2. undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 3. consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public. 4. acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to discontinue its investigation of a public complaint and its Registrar’s investigation into allegations of sexual abuse of patients and improper prescribing and administering of narcotics. 8. acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable.