Ayala Arnez, Ricardo David (CPSO#: 87465)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Mayor de San Andres, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 19 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009