Ayala-Bustamante, Everick Narcy (CPSO#: 87808)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: All radiology medical records are located at the hospitals, where patients were seen.
Date Received: 12 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 16 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014