Aye, Maung Tin (CPSO#: 23480)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2013