Ayers, Thomas Norman (CPSO#: 22421)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist
Neurosurgery Effective: 16 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993