Aylmer, Anne Patricia (CPSO#: 32190)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1978 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 31 Dec 1980
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2002 to 06 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 2002