Ayoade, Gbade Ayodeji (CPSO#: 74041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Queens Plate Drive
Etobicoke
Etobicoke ON  M9W 0B4
Phone: 416 741 4222
Fax: 416 741 9729
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 15, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 14, 2013, William Osler Health System notified the College that Dr. Gbade A. Ayoade's obstetrical privileges were suspended, effective April 15, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 4, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gbade Ayodeji Ayoade,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ayoade to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Ayoade may not engage in the practice of obstetrics in any hospital
                  setting.