Ayorinde, Raphael Omotayo (CPSO#: 92206)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ibadan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 19 Oct 2009 to 16 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2009 to 03 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2010