Ayoung-Chee, Wilson Terry (CPSO#: 60857)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Ayoung-Chee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 17 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 May 2012