Ayre, Stephanie Irene (CPSO#: 92789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519)-265-7477
Fax: (519)-265-6006
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Ayre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ayre ( CPSO# 92789 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Business Address:
Suite 208
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 265-7477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE IRENE AYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015